U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01032
  • Case Name: Doak v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • June 02, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 28, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order for Response]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 25, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 25, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.