U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01034
  • Case Name: Mission Air Support Inc v. KSNL Aero LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment]
  • April 29, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • November 23, 2021: [Withdraw]
  • November 12, 2021: [Appoint Receiver]
  • November 10, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 10, 2021: [Counterclaim]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2021: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • October 25, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.