U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01040
  • Case Name: Biggs v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 04, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • April 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 26, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 26, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 06, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.