U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01039
  • Case Name: Ringwood United Methodist Church Incorporated v. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 20, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • November 02, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • October 25, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 25, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.