U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01038
  • Case Name: Herman v. Sig Sauer Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 04, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 09, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 08, 2022: [Certificate]
  • March 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Costs]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Costs]
  • January 24, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 24, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 02, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 25, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 25, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.