U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01036
  • Case Name: Calvin v. IC Systems Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Leave]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 14, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • January 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 03, 2022: [Leave]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 11, 2021: [Strike]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 25, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.