U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01041
  • Case Name: Miller v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order for Response]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 26, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 26, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 26, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.