U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01042
  • Case Name: Hicks v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • October 11, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 12, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 12, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • March 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 26, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.