U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01044
  • Case Name: Sinclair et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.