U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01048
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Grissom et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • February 02, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Appoint Receiver]
  • January 01, 2022: [Appoint Receiver]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Deposit Funds]
  • December 30, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 22, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.