U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01045
  • Case Name: Stephenson et al v. Gulfport Energy Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • April 28, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • October 27, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.