U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01049
  • Case Name: EGR Construction Inc v. 20-20 Technologies Commercial Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 22, 2021: [Transfer Case]
  • November 09, 2021: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 28, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.