U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01043
  • Case Name: Atkinson et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 11, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • February 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • February 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.