U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01052
  • Case Name: Thurber v. Life Insurance Company of North America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.