U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01050
  • Case Name: Goin v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • November 04, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 03, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.