U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01053
  • Case Name: Wright et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 30, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 30, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • July 05, 2022: [Withdraw]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document/Directing Filing of Redacted Document]
  • June 10, 2022: [Seal Document/Directing Filing of Redacted Document]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 29, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Docket]
  • December 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.