U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01055
  • Case Name: Kong v. Tenant Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order for Response]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.