U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01057
  • Case Name: Alatorre v. Ole Mexican Foods Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 17, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.