U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01058
  • Case Name: Byrd et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 19, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 31, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 29, 2022: [Surreply]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • January 13, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 12, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 04, 2022: [Leave]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Remand]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 29, 2021: [Receipt]
  • November 28, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 19, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 05, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 02, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.