U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01056
  • Case Name: Thompson v. CACI Federal Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.