U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01061
  • Case Name: Edwards v. Integris Health Edmond Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • December 16, 2022: [Supplement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 25, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 03, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Leave]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 03, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • February 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.