U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01062
  • Case Name: Foreman et al v. Oklahoma County Sheriff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Witness List - Expert]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • March 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • February 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 03, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.