U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01063
  • Case Name: Fake Bake LLC v. GBE World Trading-FZE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Supplement]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 20, 2022: [Supplement]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 25, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • April 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.