U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01059
  • Case Name: Spiker v. Hat World Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 04, 2023: [Withdraw]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 22, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.