U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01065
  • Case Name: Tinsley v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 27, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • April 01, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 31, 2022: [Remand]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • February 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.