U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01066
  • Case Name: Bridges v. Crocker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 16, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • February 16, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • November 03, 2021: [Receipt]
  • November 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.