U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01068
  • Case Name: Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Bartels et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Default Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 04, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.