U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cv-01110
  • Case Name: Postelle v. Farris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [CJA 30 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Sealed Ex Parte Document]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.