U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00305
  • Case Name: Blue Dolphin Energy, LLC v. Ovintiv Mid-Continent Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 06, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Compel]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • November 03, 2021: [Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.