U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01069
  • Case Name: Oklahoma State of et al v. Biden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 21, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 01, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.