U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01071
  • Case Name: Miller v. The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.