U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01072
  • Case Name: State of Oklahoma v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Intervene]
  • March 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • January 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Intervene]
  • December 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.