U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01076
  • Case Name: Caston v. RKC Hotels LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.