U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01075
  • Case Name: Isenhower v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • August 08, 2022: [Remand]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • March 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • February 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.