U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01079
  • Case Name: Watford v. Basin Logistics LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 24, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 05, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 03, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 20, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • December 07, 2022: [ADR Report by Parties]
  • December 05, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • December 05, 2022: [Witness List]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2022: [ADR Report by Parties]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket]
  • December 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • December 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.