U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01081
  • Case Name: Desmet v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [USCA Order and Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 17, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 07, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 10, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.