U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01080
  • Case Name: Barbee v. Dale Rogers Training Center Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Administrative Closure]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 13, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 16, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • November 11, 2021: [Certificate]
  • November 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.