U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-00938
  • Case Name: Plant Based Foods Association et al v. Stitt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 22, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 04, 2022: [Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 07, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 19, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 16, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Quash]
  • August 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 23, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Receipt]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.