U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01086
  • Case Name: Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • May 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 01, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 01, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • February 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.