U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01082
  • Case Name: Shelton v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • November 02, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Supplement]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 03, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 20, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order for Response]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Supplement]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Receipt]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 12, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • November 12, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.