U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01085
  • Case Name: Hall v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 28, 2022: [Fourth Party Complaint]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 17, 2022: [Leave]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2022: [Strike]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 21, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • February 02, 2022: [Add Party]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.