U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01088
  • Case Name: Walsh v. Enterprise Grain Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 12, 2021: [Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.