U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01089
  • Case Name: Elite Analytics Group Inc v. Revan Health LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Compel]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 12, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.