U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01092
  • Case Name: Plater v. Bowers
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Stay Case]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Leave]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 30, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • March 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 11, 2022: [Leave]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • December 28, 2021: [Supplement]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 03, 2021: [Brief]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 15, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • November 15, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 15, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.