U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01094
  • Case Name: Hughes et al v. Oklahoma State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.