U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01121
  • Case Name: Gabriel v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 16, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • February 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 24, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.