U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01120
  • Case Name: Yang v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.