U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01122
  • Case Name: Scroggins v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 04, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • July 06, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 02, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 02, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 23, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • March 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 24, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.