U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01118
  • Case Name: Hosseini v. IC Systems Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 25, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 28, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.