U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01123
  • Case Name: Westwood Food Market v. United States The et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Reopen Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Reconsideration]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • December 06, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 30, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • November 29, 2021: [Receipt]
  • November 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.